WITNEY JUNIOR YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WHICH WILL WILL ASSIST IN THEIR DEVELOPMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 August 1993: Standard registration
- 25 November 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 November 2015: Re-registered
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Marie Wigham | Chair |
|
||||||
Rachel Hartley | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Adams | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ferrier | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Carrington | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Brown | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA BRYANT | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Colborne | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clive Barrington-Cramp | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Nicholls | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Karen Pieroni | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Lees | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mary Daniel | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.21k | £2.99k | £243 | £6.46k | £9.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.57k | £4.05k | £1.58k | £6.65k | £8.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 July 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burntwood
Church Lane
Aston
Bampton
OX18 2DY
- Phone:
- 01993 851926
- Email:
- countyoffice@ofyfc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window