Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF TORRE ABBEY

Charity number: 1025393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £99.80k £7.00k £733 £8.77k £73.80k
Total expenditure £22.12k £5.32k £7.37k £52.10k £4.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A