CONSTANCE CICELY PARKIN DECEASED WILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General upkeep of Churchyard of St James The Less Iron Acton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Malcolm Strange | Chair | 29 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Diane Heal | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
john robert Aries | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
CAROL ANN GROOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PENELOPE WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.88k | £2.86k | £2.96k | £3.06k | £3.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £9.08k | £5 | £60 | £2.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 01 January 2025 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 28 July 2022 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 08 December 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 3 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RITES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF IRON ACTON IN THE DIOCESE OF BRISTOL THROUGH THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND UPKEEP OF THE CHURCH OF ST JAMES THE LESS IRON ACTON.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE IRON ACTON NEAR BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
VINE COTTAGE
WOTTON ROAD
IRON ACTON
BRISTOL
BS37 9UZ
- Phone:
- 01454228037
- Email:
- jon@aries-family.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window