Accounts and annual returns CRAWSHAY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1025860
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 February 2022 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 February 2022 218 days late