Financial history CRAWSHAY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1025860
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £106.17k £101.64k £89.92k £58.11k £20
Total expenditure £77.46k £82.56k £92.44k £126.21k £10.15k
Income from government contracts £89.60k £71.86k £70.28k £52.29k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A