Accounts and annual returns UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE FARNBOROUGH AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1025969
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 September 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 13 September 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 June 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 June 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window