Financial history UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE FARNBOROUGH AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1025969
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £83.24k £77.51k £23.01k £140.10k £126.21k
Total expenditure £88.45k £96.86k £21.05k £113.57k £121.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A