Trustees UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE FARNBOROUGH AND DISTRICT
Charity number: 1025969

Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY PETER CARLSSON | Chair | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Minett | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Hutchings | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Layzell | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Maureen Hay | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stephen Banner | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Francis Wickwar | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lia Culverhouse | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Marise King | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.