THE HACKNEY CARRIAGE DRIVERS CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benevolence to Licensed Hackney Carriage Drivers. Support of in trade events. The Children's Magical Tour. An annual three day trip for children with life threatening diseases to Disney Resort Paris.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 September 1993: Standard registration
- 11 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1172474 THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF HACKNEY CARRIAGE DRIVERS...
- CHCD CHARITABLE TRUST MAGICAL TAXI TOUR (Working name)
- THE CHILDRENS' MAGICAL TAXI TOUR (Working name)
- THE COMPANY OF HACKNEY CARRIAGE DRIVERS CHARITY TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.40k | £175.43k | £210.13k | £201.93k | £247.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.50k | £179.46k | £165.67k | £170.05k | £197.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 13 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 13 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 14 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 14 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 28 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 28 April 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 27TH AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN LONDON AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window