MEDECINS SANS FRONTIERES (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve and promote the relief of sickness and to provide medical aid to the injured and to protect and preserve good health by the provision of medical supplies, personnel and procedures calculated to overcome disease, injury or malnutrition in any part of the world in accordance with the principles espoused by the International Council of Medecins Sans Frontieres in October 1990.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£85,261,392
Donations and legacies | £79.53m | |
Charitable activities | £5.45m | |
Other trading activities | £35.66k | |
Investments | £148.13k | |
Other | £98.56k |
Total expenditure:
£84,046,648
Raising funds | £12.18m | |
Charitable activities | £71.87m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £12.18m | |
Charitable expenditure | £71.87m | |
Retained for future use | £1.21m |
People

206 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 16 |
£70k to £80k | 10 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- Chad
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ethiopia
- Guinea
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Italy
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Mozambique
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Sudan
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- Uzbekistan
- Yemen
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 29 September 1993: Standard registration
- 27 February 2017: Funds received from 803425 THE RIVERHOLM TRUST
- 17 April 2019: Funds received from 1068293 THE NOVA CHARITABLE TRUST
- 25 October 2019: Funds received from 1014779 SIERRA LEONE ASSOCIATION NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BRANCH
- 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1143457 THE LYCETT HUMANITARIAN TRUST
- 26 October 2021: Funds received from 1153478 DOCTORS FOR MADAGASCAR UK
- 12 July 2022: Funds received from 257972 IDA MORTLOCK SADLER TRUST
- 26 August 2022: Funds received from 1034844 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BANGOR BENEVOLENT FUND
- 01 September 2022: Funds received from 267055 THE JOAN TANNER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
- 01 March 2023: Funds received from 297328 HAND IN HAND GROUP
- 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1014220 WHITTINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST
- M S F U K (Working name)
- MSF (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sabrina Das | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Bwango | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Bertrand Taithe | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Monk | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Symington | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iesha Singh | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jehangir Dhunjishaw Ghandhi | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Innocent Muleya | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emery Igiraneza | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eve Esther Bruce | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachael Mary Craven | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Peskett | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vita Sanderson | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.65m | £72.68m | £68.02m | £76.83m | £85.26m | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.42m | £69.39m | £71.89m | £76.95m | £84.05m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £60.56m | £68.23m | £63.47m | £71.64m | £79.53m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £35.66k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.99m | £4.16m | £4.46m | £4.76m | £5.45m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £34.83k | £15.79k | £8.02k | £25.74k | £148.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £57.16k | £272.25k | £79.94k | £406.09k | £98.56k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £20.10m | £19.67m | £12.31m | £17.97m | £18.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £52.07m | £60.98m | £62.28m | £66.66m | £71.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.35m | £8.41m | £9.61m | £10.29m | £12.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £342.88k | £107.02k | £97.60k | £121.78k | £165.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £39.98m | £49.21m | £0 | £49.78m | £53.83m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £532.54k | £725.52k | £1.19m | £1.33m | £1.13m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £23.09m | £34.11m | £29.04m | £27.74m | £25.80m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.84m | £19.76m | £19.03m | £17.99m | £14.64m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 30 MARCH 2001, 12 APRIL 2002, 5 AUGUST 2005, 29 MAY 2009 AND 5 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAY 2017 as amended on 19 May 2018 as amended on 20 May 2023 as amended on 18 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE MEDICAL AID TO THE INJURED AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SUPPLIES, PERSONNEL AND PROCEDURES CALCULATED TO OVERCOME DISEASE, INJURY OR MALNUTRITION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Level 5
Artesian
9 Prescot Street
London
E1 8PR
- Phone:
- 02074046600
- Email:
- office-ldn@london.msf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window