ROTARY CLUB OF STEVENAGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1027450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Rotary Club of Stevenage raises and provides charitable funding or services within Stevenage, the County of Hertfordshire, nationally within the UK, and internationally in response to areas of natural disasters e.g flood, earthquake, hurricane, fire, etc., and also to fund/match-fund educational, environmental and humanitarian issues worldwide - also supporting our four Twin Towns.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £448
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire
  • Kenya
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 October 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEWART SHUTTLE Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
LINDA LANG Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Geraldine Alison Strohm Trustee 09 April 2024
None on record
PAMELA GOODWIN Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.70k £2.12k £1.80k £3.14k £448
Total expenditure £7.40k £1.94k £1.39k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 April 2024 346 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
78 LINGFIELD ROAD
STEVENAGE
SG1 5SQ
Phone:
07717254912