Trustees Turning Tides Homelessness

Charity Number: 1027832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Ranger Trustee 12 May 2025
None on record
Peter Holloway Trustee 12 May 2025
None on record
Samantha James Trustee 12 May 2025
None on record
Victoria Kavan Trustee 17 February 2025
None on record
Jonathan Rosser Trustee 13 May 2024
Age UK West Sussex, Brighton & Hove
Received: On time
Daniel Keech Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
Nicholas Beverley-Hedger Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Bill Jones Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
DUNCAN ANDERSON Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Martin Quinn Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record