RUSSIAN LANGUAGE UNDERGRADUATE STUDIES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is the advancement of public education by organising and facilitating educational courses and placements in colleges and universities in Estonia and Kazakhstan for students from United Kingdom universities and colleges.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Estonia
- Kazakhstan
Governance
- 12 November 1993: Standard registration
- RLUS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Clark | Chair | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Andrew Wake Fergus | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr LYNNE ATTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.46k | £303.95k | £162.12k | £312.96k | £289.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.31k | £321.85k | £162.79k | £351.85k | £291.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2020
(These accounts |
14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 15 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ORGANISING AND FACILITATING EDUCATIONAL COURSES AND PLACEMENTS IN COUNTRIES IN WHICH RUSSIAN IS WIDELY SPOKEN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ESTONIA OR KAZAKHSTAN, FOR STUDENTS FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Glossop Road
Little Hayfield
HIGH PEAK
Derbyshire
SK22 2NG
- Phone:
- 07378627788
- Email:
- KATHRYN.ROYLE@RLUS.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window