WARRIORS OF PRAISE MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate as a UK prayer base for the nations. Our building is used for teaching, training and education, also for fundraising and administration. Abroad we pioneer projects to feed/educate destitute children. We encourage local farming, medical & health education. Future plans are to help projects become more self sufficient.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
- Belgium
- Canada
- India
- Pakistan
- Uganda
Governance
- 17 November 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISTAIR MARTIN SCOTT | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
ROBERT ELLIOTT | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
REV BRYAN PICKARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN HOLME | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.57k | £50.29k | £60.56k | £48.78k | £65.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.51k | £130.42k | £100.58k | £68.96k | £64.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS. 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION. 3.THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lodge
Wimland Road
Rusper
HORSHAM
RH12 4QU
- Phone:
- 07718919729
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window