Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BANGOR CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1029097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.85k £16.99k £8.28k £8.86k £3.22k
Total expenditure £22.09k £16.46k £8.29k £8.89k £4.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A