THE WOODHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1029144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of poverty and in particular the relief of need among the employees of Hall & Woodhouse Limited (and its successors and associated companies) and widows, children and other dependents of such employees and former employees at such time and in such manner as the trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit. The trustees usually make loans or grants to beneficiaries.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £29,759
Total expenditure: £19,820

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • WOODHOUSE BREWERY TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK JOHN MICHAEL WOODHOUSE Chair
BLACKMORE VALE RDA
Received: On time
Peter Gatehouse Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Julia Weaver Trustee 11 August 2022
None on record
Oliver Woodhouse Trustee 26 November 2021
None on record
Charles Wheeler Trustee 26 November 2021
None on record
Lucinda Jane WOODHOUSE Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
RAOUL VICTOR SOISSONS DE Trustee 03 December 2013
None on record
RACHEL LOUISE WHITENSTALL Trustee 24 January 2012
None on record
MICHAEL CHARLES LACEY WOODHOUSE Trustee
None on record
ANDREW JOHN WING Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.15k £38.99k £21.57k £12.44k £29.76k
Total expenditure £18.15k £20.77k £20.61k £20.30k £19.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hall & Woodhouse Ltd
The Brewery
Blandford Forum
DT11 9LS
Phone:
01258457559
Website:

No information available