LINTON GRANTA PLAYGROUP AND TODDLERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DAY CARE OF CHILDREN AGED 2 TO 5 YEARS FUNDRAISING TODDLER GROUP FOR CHILDREN BIRTH TO 5 YEARS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £4,120 from 5 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 29 November 1993: Standard registration
- 30 April 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 April 2021: Funds transferred to 1090719 CHESTNUT PLAYGROUP
- LINTON GRANTA PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- LINTON GRANTA PLAYGROUP AND MOTHER AND TODDLER GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.30k | £58.99k | £65.07k | £60.16k | £47.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.50k | £58.93k | £56.64k | £59.10k | £58.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £495 | N/A | £4.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 19 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 19 March 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 01 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 01 June 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 3RD APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THIER CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window