NORTHERN NORWICH SCOUT DISTRICT

Charity number: 1029956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

scouting for young people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £64,880
Total expenditure: £57,154

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NORWICH NORTH SCOUT DISTRICT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEVILLE PETER JARVIS Chair 01 July 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET, DRAYTON, IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH
Recently registered
Carolyn Jane Barr Trustee 14 October 2024
18TH NORWICH (1ST HELLESDON) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Simon Ronald Mobbs Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Toby John Whitaker Hartley Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
James Joseph Andrew Dearden Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
Andrew Steven Cooke Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
Leslie Samuels Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Martin Peter Page Trustee 04 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £99.00k £49.28k £43.62k £59.95k £64.88k
Total expenditure £101.92k £50.62k £41.68k £59.59k £57.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 06 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 06 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 05 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 21 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 14 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 14 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 CHESTNUT HILL
NORWICH
NR4 6NL
Phone:
01603 451988