THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY

Charity Number: 1030406
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the charity are to improve women's health through the provision, advancement and dissemination of the highest quality education, standards and research information around ultrasound in obstetrics and gynecology.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Australia
  • China
  • Colombia
  • Egypt
  • Greece
  • Haiti
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Northern Ireland
  • Oman
  • Scotland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ISUOG (Working name)
  • THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNAECOLOGY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prof. Laurent Salomon Chair 06 October 2013
None on record
Dr Mala Sibal Trustee 15 September 2024
None on record
Dr Suresh Seshadri Trustee 15 September 2024
None on record
Dr Simon Meagher Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Dr Alexandros Sotiriadis Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Dr Ritsuko Pu Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Dr Fatima Crispi Brillas Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Dr George Condous Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Dr Jessica Preisler Romanow Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Prof. Asma Khalil Trustee 19 October 2020
ISUOG COURSES AND CONFERENCES LIMITED
Received: On time
GEFOG HEALTH FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Prof. Liona Poon Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record
Dr Reem Abu-Rustum Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record
Prof. Thomas Bourne Trustee 11 October 2015
None on record
Prof. Caterina Bilardo Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.84m £2.17m £2.21m £2.98m £3.97m
Total expenditure £3.53m £2.54m £2.79m £3.84m £4.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £20 £520 £3.93k £3.87k £2.80k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £23.72k £25.34k £754 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.77m £2.11m £2.15m £2.77m £3.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.35k £37.99k £31.61k £187.14k £217.55k
Income - Other £24.22k £0 £0 £24.17k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.53m £2.54m £2.79m £3.84m £4.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £212.51k £202.53k £0 £354.31k £303.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.95m £1.89m £1.83m £1.75m £1.70m
Long-term investments £7.79m £8.46m £9.84m £8.86m £9.71m
Other assets £4.01m £3.84m £3.24m £2.77m £2.20m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £474.44k £684.87k £595.80k £819.03k £516.01k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 December 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 December 2024 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF
ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS
AND GYNECOLOGY
122 FRESTON ROAD
LONDON
W10 6TR
Phone:
02074719955