Financial history INNER WHEEL CLUB OF CHESTERFIELD SCARSDALE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1031147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.01k £3.35k £8.64k £4.30k £2.97k
Total expenditure £1.73k £2.33k £6.60k £3.81k £2.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A