UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE CIRENCESTER BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides educational support for older people no longer in full time employment in the Cirencester area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
700 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 January 1994: Standard registration
- Cirencester University of The Third Age (u3a) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Boydell | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Ann Webley | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cox | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sanders | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lang | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Vardy | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Harvey | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.29k | £8.09k | £16.18k | £25.40k | £28.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.74k | £7.75k | £14.02k | £25.72k | £22.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/05/1992 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2002 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 17 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CIRENCESTER AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wains Cottage
Wains Road
Daglingworth
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 7AN
- Phone:
- 07931 541327
- Email:
- treasurercirenu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window