FRIENDS OF THE YEATMAN HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising activities. Grants of money to The Yeatman Hospital, Sherborne, to improve hospital facilities and provide benefits to patients: redecoration, supplementary equipment and furniture, garden provision and maintenance, newspapers for patients, flowers, drinks machines, television services, supplementary therapies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Air Marshal Sir Christopher Charles Cotton Coville KCB | Chair | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Anthony Charrington | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Lisa Katherine Lewis | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vaughan Coleridge-Matthews | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Maria Johnsen | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Clare Mears | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Wingfield Digby | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Whybrew | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Parkinson | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hartley | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW THOMPSON | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £743.96k | £86.73k | £395.59k | £67.57k | £115.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.84k | £71.86k | £93.19k | £176.08k | £244.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £733.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £666.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £65.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.45k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £22.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 February 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 February 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/1997 AS AMENDED ON 19/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2015 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUL 2016 as amended on 16 Nov 2020 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE NEEDS OF PATIENTS; AND TO MOBILISE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST AND SUPPORT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE AUTHORITIES IN THE HOSPITAL. (2) TO SUPPLEMENT THE SERVICE PROVIDED BY THE HOSPITAL FOR THE TREATMENT, HEALTH, WELFARE AND COMFORT OF THE PATIENTS IN NEED OF MEDICAL SUPPORT BY THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES, FACILITIES, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND FINANCE, WHICH MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE CARE OF SUCH PATIENTS OR FOR THE EFFICIENT RUNNING OF THE HOSPITAL (3) TO SUPPORT INITIATIVES AIMED AT IMPROVING THE HEALTH OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY INCLUDING HEALTH EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SHERBORNE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of The Yeatman Hospital
Yeatman Hospital
Hospital Lane
SHERBORNE
Dorset
DT9 3JU
- Phone:
- 01935 813991
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window