THE ESSEX BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote and further the craft of beekeeping.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 13 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Cameron | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Morris | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Dannatt | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jerry Hartland | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith William Lomax | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Mills | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Honey | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Mary Wilkinson | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Linley | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Yeats | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard Nicholson | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.04k | £91.77k | £92.07k | £91.16k | £96.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.34k | £75.23k | £68.65k | £90.55k | £87.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/02/1993 AS AMENDED ON 27/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2012 as amended on 05 Jan 2021 as amended on 08 Nov 2022 as amended on 20 Mar 2024 as amended on 20 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moat House
Langley Upper Green
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB11 4RU
- Phone:
- 07714718723
- Email:
- CHAIR@EBKA.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window