Accounts and annual returns INNER WHEEL CLUB OF HAVERING

Charity number: 1031542
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 May 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required