Financial history COUNTESS OF MUNSTER MUSICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1031783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £125.47k £98.48k £252.11k £382.81k £146.14k
Total expenditure £318.96k £343.22k £400.46k £398.68k £442.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A