Financial history SOUTHAMPTON STAGE DANCE FESTIVAL

Charity Number: 1032283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11 £9.42k £13.42k £22.95k £16.91k
Total expenditure £2.96k £11.19k £15.46k £28.99k £19.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A