ROTARY CLUB OF WOLLATON PARK TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £29,362
Total expenditure: £29,991

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROTARY CLUB OF WOLLATON PARK CHARITY ACCOUNT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter John Boyd Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN Trustee 24 May 2017
THE MARY ROBERTSON TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN POWELL Trustee 24 May 2017
Dickinson Massey Underwood Gill Trust
Received: On time
JOHN AND ELIZA JELLEY HOMES FOR OLD PEOPLE
Received: On time
JOHN CLIFFORD MBA Trustee
None on record
JOHN CHARLES FOXON Trustee
Dickinson Massey Underwood Gill Trust
Received: On time
NOTTINGHAM GORDON MEMORIAL TRUST FOR BOYS AND GIRLS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £52.87k £27.63k £28.18k £27.05k £29.36k
Total expenditure £63.16k £25.31k £25.03k £32.69k £29.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 31 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 SUTTON PASSEYS CRESCENT
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 1BX
Phone:
01159783185
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available