NORFOLK MILLS AND PUMPS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the trust are the preservation of; a) Windmills, watermills & windpumps of interest or the sites and remains of former windmills, windpumps & watermills b) Machinery for milling corn, saw milling, grist milling, paper milling & other similar industrial purposes or pumping water however powered; buildings & machinery ancillary to and occupied with such mills, sites or machinery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 February 1994: Standard registration
- THE NORFOLK WINDMILLS TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Robert Plant | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Nigel Brennan | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Anthony White | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Duigan | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith Philip Bacon | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.97k | £157.00k | £67.09k | £69.54k | £35.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.06k | £132.16k | £62.67k | £21.03k | £64.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.00k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.55k | £109.84k | £18.34k | £2.89k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION (INCLUDING MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE OF: A) WINDMILLS, WATERMILLS AND WINDPUMPS OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC INTEREST OR THE SITES AND REMAINS OF FORMER WINDMILLS, WINDPUMPS AND WATERMILLS; B) MACHINERY FOR MILLING CORN, SAW MILLING, GRIST MILLING, PAPER MILLING AND OTHER SIMILAR INDUSTRIAL PURPOSES OR PUMPING WATER HOWSOEVER POWERED; C) BUILDINGS AND MACHINERY ANCILLARY TO AND OCCUPIED WITH SUCH MILLS, SITES OR MACHINERY.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORFOLK WINDMILLS TRUST
Norfolk County Council
County Hall
Martineau Lane
NORWICH
NR1 2DH
- Phone:
- 01362869394
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window