40TH STROOD SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the develop young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local national and international communities by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training, based on the Scout Promise and Law and guided by adult leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL BILLIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Souter | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Collins | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael TURNER | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Munn | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE YOUNGER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Darren Lake | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Derek Smith | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM WRAIGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR ANDY COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.65k | £33.29k | £25.42k | £62.65k | £53.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.67k | £14.19k | £16.90k | £81.11k | £42.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.86k | £13.00k | £10.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
38th & 40th Strood Sea Scouts
Dart Close
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME2 2EH
- Phone:
- 07963199569
- Email:
- treasurer3840@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window