ST MARGARET'S ANGMERING TRUST
Charity number: 1033850
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a Non-Endowment Trust operating from the Parish of Angmering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income: £2,260
Total expenditure: £3,228
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- West Sussex
Governance
Registration history:
- 25 February 1994: Standard registration
- 05 June 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 05 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1131362 PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ANGMERING ST MARGARET
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.37k | £14.44k | £14.16k | £1.02k | £2.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.88k | £16.08k | £13.47k | £2.19k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED FOR FURTHER DETAILS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE THE PARISH OF ST MARGARET IN ANGMERING
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window