Financial history THE TYNEDALE TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 1034087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.15k £6.07k £4.54k £3.15k £1.88k
Total expenditure £4.89k £6.45k £1.40k £2.84k £3.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A