Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF MARKET HARBOROUGH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1034200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.39k £12.78k £5.98k £10.94k £17.60k
Total expenditure £18.65k £15.49k £6.61k £11.43k £17.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A