HORLEY CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity number: 1034410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To further the spiritual growth of its members, to promote the spread of Bible-based Christianity in the UK & overseas and to contribute to other charitable causes, primarily of a Christian nature

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £22,416
Total expenditure: £18,426

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Kent
  • Surrey
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WEST SUSSEX CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosalind Virginia Coverley Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Russell John Skinner Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Hilary Christine Knight Trustee 05 January 2024
None on record
DAWN SKINNER Trustee 18 December 2013
None on record
CHARLES WILLIAM ABEL Trustee
None on record
Dr Stuart Russel Walker Trustee
THE MINDFUL FOUNDATION
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £19.34k £33.76k £19.54k £33.52k £22.42k
Total expenditure £26.29k £25.07k £28.58k £26.98k £18.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 14 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GROVE HOUSE
BEACONSFIELD ROAD
CHELWOOD GATE
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 7JU
Phone:
01825740283