MALMESBURY ABBEY MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of musical performances in Malmesbury Abbey, and other musical activities for the benefit of the membership and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 14 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Carolyn Cambray-Smith | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dawn Drake | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Christine Hughes | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Daws | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Palmer | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GEORGE WOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.02k | £4.84k | £2.58k | £87 | £38 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.28k | £4.45k | £1.95k | £200 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME, PROVIDING IT REMAINS CHARITABLE IN LAW, WITHIN THE AREA OF MALMESBURY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MALMESBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coombe
Crab Mill Lane
Lea
MALMESBURY
Wiltshire
SN16 9NF
- Phone:
- 01666 824029
- Email:
- cwdaws@fastmail.fm
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window