Accounts and annual returns THE STANDISH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1035270
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2022 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required