Financial history GOTHAM PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1035503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £69.48k £50.84k £67.99k £53.79k £91.13k
Total expenditure £61.81k £63.87k £59.60k £52.58k £69.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £30.72k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A