Trustees GOTHAM PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1035503

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Moreman | Chair | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Patala | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roxanne Nicholls | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Thorley | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Jenny Howard | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Harrison | Trustee | 17 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.