1ST TADWORTH SEA SCOUTS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the group are as a unit of the Scout Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 April 1994: Standard registration
- 22 May 2020: Funds received from 269869 TATTENHAMS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Moss | Chair | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Brown | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice-May Smith | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Thekkepat | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY HAWKER | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
LISA PATTERSON | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hawker | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.41k | £23.59k | £36.84k | £33.51k | £23.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.31k | £9.82k | £16.62k | £29.36k | £23.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.91k | £9.83k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 January 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE TADWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Holt
Alcocks Lane
TADWORTH
Surrey
KT20 6BB
- Phone:
- 07712530516
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Your cookie preferences have been updated
Cookies on My Charity Commission Account
Cookies are files saved on your phone, tablet or computer when you visit a website.
We use cookies to collect information about how you use My Charity Commission Account.
Cookie settings
We use 2 types of cookie.
Cookies that measure website use
We use Google Analytics to measure how you use the website so we can improve it based on user needs. We do not allow Google to use or share the data about how you use this site with third parties.
Google Analytics sets cookies that store anonymised information about:
- how you got to the site
- the pages you visit and how long you spend on each page
- what you click on while you're visiting the site
Strictly necessary cookies
These essential cookies do things like enable core functionality such as security, network management, and accessibility.
They always need to be on.
Find out more about cookies on My Charity Commission Account.Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window