THE INKBERROW SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1036319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting educational work (especially Religious Education) within the ancient parish of Inkberrow

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,205
Total expenditure: £507

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • INKBERROW SCHOOL TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD M BARRETT Chair
None on record
Tafadzwa Harriet Terera Trustee 03 November 2021
WORCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Frances Jane Pons Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Jenny Ann Rose Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.70k £2.52k £2.62k £2.89k £3.21k
Total expenditure £1.34k £26 £204 £358 £507
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ruslin
Tibberton
DROITWICH
Worcestershire
WR9 7NP
Phone:
07802170508
Website:

No information available