Trustees ACTION FOR ME
Charity number: 1036419
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Siddle | Chair | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Elizabeth Boyle | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Banks | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Jessie Bulmer | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nirmala Santiapillai | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julianne Devine | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rollo Hope | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Courtney | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Manuel | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Vernon De Boo | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|||||
David Bernard Leigh | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BATTEN | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matt Symonds | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Susan Hardy | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Stacey | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.