Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF STREATHAM TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1036425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 February 2025 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 20 July 2023 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 May 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 October 2021 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required