GREENFORD PLAYING FIELDS LIMITED

Charity number: 1036672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Greenford Playing Fields offers the provision of open space, buildings and facilities for sport and recreation in the area of west London.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heather Taylor Trustee 12 July 2022
THE MOTHERHOOD PLAN
Received: On time
PRENDERGAST LADYWELL FIELDS PRIMARY PTA
Received: 46 days late
Mandeep Hothi Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MISS CAROL HARRISON
4-7 CHISWELL STREET
LONDON
EC1Y 4UP
Phone:
02076066145
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available