Financial history MONTROSE PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1037511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £111.97k £118.30k £123.21k £112.95k £143.26k
Total expenditure £102.73k £119.60k £122.25k £120.67k £120.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £101.70k £113.26k £112.96k £97.40k N/A