LEICESTER ANGLICAN CURSILLO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A movement of the Church providing a method by which Christians are empowered to grow through prayer, study and action and enabled to share Gods love with everyone
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 17 May 1994: Standard registration
- LEICESTER CURSILLO (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Henson | Chair | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Flower | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Bolton | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN TABBERER | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joy Allman | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Meredith | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elaine Karen Wykes | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Fenwick Trotter | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.15k | £6.42k | £10.39k | £10.02k | £20.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.54k | £3.22k | £11.06k | £20.31k | £14.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 14 APRIL 1994 as amended on 20 Sep 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF LEICESTER
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LEICESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Oxford Street
Shepshed
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 9HU
- Phone:
- 07721 562404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window