Financial history MIRES BECK NURSERY

Charity number: 1038078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £960.17k £797.55k £884.09k £1.10m £1.17m
Total expenditure £802.86k £889.66k £1.00m £1.07m £1.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £177.25k £67.85k £146.39k £188.39k £146.83k
Income - Other trading activities £139.79k £203.37k £231.28k £266.41k £266.15k
Income - Charitable activities £573.90k £509.04k £503.11k £645.62k £752.55k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £140 £20 £19 £610 £902
Income - Other £69.10k £17.27k £3.30k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £733.27k £798.16k £823.29k £1.03m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £69.59k £91.50k £168.25k £36.86k £29.94k
Expenditure - Governance £12.88k £9.71k £9.43k £18.36k £17.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £27.82k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £9.43k £0 £0