THE TOYBOX PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development & education of children under statutory school age 2 1/2 - 4 yrs by encouraging parents to understand and provide for their children through community groups we follow EYFS curriculum subject to a full ofsted inspections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £83,525 from 1 government contract(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 May 1994: Standard registration
- THE TOYBOX PLAYGROUP (CASTLE CARY) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Hobhouse | Chair | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alexander Adam Murphy | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ecaterina Comarnitcaia | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jude Medlen | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dionne Banbury | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Georgina Hole | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Hayley Groves | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Penelope Smillie | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Frances Eleanor Alden | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Hannah Garden-Cressey | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jessica Thompson | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laura Tilling | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Emma Clarke | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stephen Higgins | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.92k | £58.07k | £70.63k | £93.02k | £108.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.93k | £55.19k | £64.68k | £79.29k | £101.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £83.53k | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.30k | £50.15k | £63.09k | £75.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 2009 as amended on 23 Nov 2022 as amended on 23 Nov 2022 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY; (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF SUCH NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Toybox Pre-School
Swainson Building
Ansford Park
CASTLE CARY
BA77JJ
- Phone:
- 01963359600
- Email:
- toyboxcastlecary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window