Trustees GRESHAM VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nishaa Tweed Chair 15 January 2025
None on record
Janet Bolderston Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Deborah Goodrum Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Barbara Russell Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Rachel Hannam Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Carolyn Arnold Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record
JOY ANN COOPER Trustee
NORTH NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time