Financial history LLANGURIG INDEPENDENT CEMETERY

Charity Number: 1038403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £336 £848 £331 £820 £767
Total expenditure £339 £364 £464 £364 £364
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A