THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Army efficiency by: contact between past and present members of The Rifles, the RGBW its forming and antecedent regts; fostering esprit de corps; and, addressing hardship. This is exercised by: promoting past deeds; encouraging museums and their day to day operation; making grants to 1054647, the Regimental Trust; support to memorials; and, observing other powers within the Constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- Isle Of Wight
- Reading
- Slough
- South Gloucestershire
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 09 June 1994: Standard registration
- 23 September 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 23 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1119061 THE RIFLES REGIMENTAL TRUST
- REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION OF THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT (Previous name)
- THE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION OF THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.93k | £22.26k | £19.03k | £11.33k | £188 | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.31k | £96.21k | £45.38k | £425.56k | £41.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 1996, 5 JULY 1998 AND 20 MARCH 1999. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT ASSOCIATION ("THE ASSOCIATION" AND "THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMY BY: (A) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST OR PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE RIFLES ("THE REGIMENT") AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT ("RGBW"), THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT (28TH AND 61ST), THE ROYAL BERKSHIRE REGIMENT (PRINCESS CHARLOTTE OF WALES'S), THE WILTSHIRE REGIMENT (DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S), THE DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S ROYAL REGIMENT (BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY ("THE FORMER REGIMENTS"), FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP AND PROVIDING SOCIAL GATHERINGS FOR THEM; (B) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND WELFARE OF THE REGIMENT AND PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS AND THOSE OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS; (C) RELIEVING, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ("BENEFICIARIES").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window