JUBILEE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
social meetings and outings for retired people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 21 June 1994: Standard registration
- 09 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 09 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1091058 AGE CONCERN ESSEX
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £477 | £658 | £551 | £672 | £441 | |
|
Total expenditure | £889 | £1.02k | £636 | £634 | £612 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 09 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH MAY 1989, AND AMENDED 3RD MARCH 1994 AND 26TH MAY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, WITHIN THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF SAFFRON WALDEN, COMPRISING SAFFRON WALDEN TOWN AND THE VILLAGES OF AUDLEY END, SEWARDS END, LITTLE WALDEN AND LITTLEBURY.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF SAFFRON WALDEN COMPRISING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window